HARRIS HOSPISCARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities have been transferred to St Christopher's Hospice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 27 August 1991: Standard registration
- 13 July 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 July 2016: Funds transferred to 210667 ST CHRISTOPHERS HOSPICE
- SOUTH BROMLEY HOSPISCARE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.38m | £2.33m | £2.30m | £1.87m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87m | £1.81m | £1.84m | £1.40m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £823.00k | £723.00k | £646.00k | £583.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £712.00k | £739.00k | £740.00k | £385.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £743.00k | £739.00k | £0 | £770.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £30.00k | £45.00k | £51.00k | £37.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £76.00k | £85.00k | £862.00k | £96.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £353.00k | £291.00k | £182.00k | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.20m | £1.19m | £1.18m | £1.15m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.00k | £24.00k | £23.00k | £21.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 17 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 02 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE (IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE SAME SHALL BE CHARITABLE) RECRUITING AND MAINTAINING A TEAM OF PEOPLE - (A)TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PERSONS RESIDING, NORMALLY RESIDENT OR IN HOSPITAL WITHIN THE AREA OF SOUTH BROMLEY SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS OF A TERMINAL NATURE AND IN PARTICULAR TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO LIVE AT HOME, OR IN A HOSPITAL AS IS APPROPRIATE AND (B)TO HELP WITH THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND OTHER SYMPTOMS AND TO OFFER ADVICE, PRACTICAL HELP AND EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS,SUPPORT FOR THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BOTH DURING THE LIFETIME OF THE PATIENT AND SUBSEQUENTLY IN BEREAVEMENT. SOUTH BROMLEY - MEANING THE SOUTHERN PART OF LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY EXTENDING FROM CHISLEHURST AND THE CRAYS TO BIGGIN HILL, INCLUDING BICKLEY, PETTES WOOD, ORPINGTON, CHELSFIELD, FARNBOROUGH, KESTON, GREEN STREET GREEN AND ALL CONNECTING OR ADJOINING AREAS WITHIN THE SAID BOROUGH. IF SO REQUESTED BY GENERAL PRACTITIONERS OR ORGANISATIONS HAVING THE SAME OR SIMILAR OBJECTIVES AND SERVING THE TERMINALLY ILL IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS, THE COMPANY MAY REGARD SUCH NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS A PART OF SOUTH BROMLEY FOR THE PURPOSE OF EXTENDING ITS SERVICES TO THOSE NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Area of benefit
SOTUH BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window