Financial history WHITEFIELD COMMUNITY KOLLEL

Charity Number: 1004263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £57.33k £188.23k £117.99k £57.35k £28.48k
Total expenditure £66.19k £50.59k £66.65k £94.89k £120.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.58k £11.92k N/A N/A