Financial history THE ROGER LANCELYN GREEN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1004447
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £57.38k £54.04k £54.40k £56.28k £57.69k
Total expenditure £91.50k £90.50k £41.72k £67.98k £39.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A