Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SOUTH WILTS GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1004467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 September 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 August 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required