Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF TAUNTON VALE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1005550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.23k £10.03k £45.70k £39.35k £32.57k
Total expenditure £34.10k £13.53k £46.63k £36.51k £30.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A