THE TEMPLETON EDUCATION AND CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Trust is support charities in particular to advance education in business management and to advance religion. On 8 May 2001 the Trustees resolved to dedicate the whole of the endowment fund for the benefit of Green Templeton College, Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Templeton Dill | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hughes-Penney | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Webster | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN W SCHOTT MD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY INCOME AND CAPITAL TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN BUSINESS MANAGEMENT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE
43 WOODSTOCK ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6HG
- Phone:
- 01865284593
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window