Financial history KNARESBOROUGH AND DISTRICT MEN'S FORUM

Charity number: 1007028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.13k £171 £8.02k £8.40k £7.58k
Total expenditure £6.60k £316 £7.61k £7.58k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A