Financial history HENRY ALLEN NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1007815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/10/2019 23/10/2020 23/10/2021 23/10/2022 23/10/2023
Total gross income £6.38k £3.13k £6.11k £11.25k £6.88k
Total expenditure £6.95k £3.41k £5.07k £11.17k £5.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A