ROMSEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORSE SHOW SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote agriculture & allied industries partially through an Agricultural & Horse Show
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 February 1992: Standard registration
- ROMSEY (Working name)
- ROMSEY SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORTON Vincent WELCH | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Riley | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dan Hallett | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Denise Brooks | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Harper-Adams | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Patricia Holmes | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter John McVean | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN FOORD | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATRICIA CORBIN | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE ANN KELL | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MICHAEL CORBIN | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEAN ROWLANDSON | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HARTAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MONK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY JANE RAWSON-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £404.19k | £48.93k | £30.33k | £364.72k | £279.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.40k | £96.66k | £72.31k | £299.67k | £296.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £16.00k | £14.50k | £6.00k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 1989 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2006. AS AMENDED ON 07 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY, HORTICULTURE, ALLIED INDUSTRIES, RURAL CRAFTS, THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK INCLUDING HORSES, AND TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN SUCH ENTERPRISES. (2)TO HOLD IN PURSUANCE OF ITS MAIN OBJECTS AN ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT BE OBLIGED TO HOLD A SHOW IN ANY YEAR IN RELATION TO WHICH THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETY SHALL RESOLVE THAT THE HOLDING OF SUCH SHOW IS IMPRACTICABLE OR NOT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Romsey Agricultural & Horse Show
Society
4 The Old Carthouses
Broadlands Park
ROMSEY
SO51 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01794517521
- Email:
- info@romseyshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window