HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1008049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the advancement of education for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,304
Total expenditure: £3,359

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER MAURICE ENTWISTLE Chair
None on record
DAVID ASHBY Trustee 23 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.31k £11.45k £8.84k £3.72k £3.30k
Total expenditure £7.41k £10.07k £11.12k £11.27k £3.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LOWER ROAD
EFFINGHAM
SURREY
KT24 5JR
Phone:
01372453694
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available