FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST

Charity number: 1009087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty and suffering in the parish of Highweek Devon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,811
Total expenditure: £5,809

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD JENKS Chair 16 July 2019
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
HIGHWEEK CHARITIES
Received: On time
Liz BATSFORD Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Richard BUSCOMBE Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
PENNY HAMMOND Trustee 01 May 2022
HIGHWEEK CHARITIES
Received: On time
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
olly giddings Trustee 01 May 2022
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
Liz Roberts Trustee 01 December 2019
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF ROBERT HUGO MONTAGU BAKER FOR WOLBOROUGH AND NEWTON
Received: On time
WOLBOROUGH PARISH LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
J W LEY TRUST
Received: On time
PHILIP BULLIVANT Trustee 16 July 2019
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
NEWTON ABBOT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
HIGHWEEK CHARITIES
Received: On time
ROBERT BRYANT Trustee 12 March 2019
HIGHWEEK CHARITIES
Received: On time
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
Rev gareth REGAN Trustee 01 November 2018
HIGHWEEK CHARITIES
Received: On time
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.91k £5.13k £5.19k £5.68k £5.81k
Total expenditure £5.91k £5.13k £5.19k £5.68k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 November 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 CASTLEWOOD AVENUE
HIGHWEEK
NEWTON ABBOT
DEVON
TQ12 1NX
Phone:
01626367693
Website:

No information available