Financial history KESSER CHARITIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1009126
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £112.66k £76.20k £65.34k £64.76k £206.93k
Total expenditure £120.94k £101.81k £103.63k £66.74k £209.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A