Trustees CHUNDIKULI TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1009205
Charity reporting is up to date (117 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Muttiah Theivendra Chair 11 May 2024
None on record
Dayalini Joseph Trustee 10 May 2025
None on record
Sivakumar Ratnasingham Trustee 11 May 2024
None on record
Dr Pushpam Vinayagamoorthy Trustee 11 May 2024
None on record
Ambikai Puvi Trustee 11 May 2024
None on record
Easterine Agita Suresh Trustee 11 May 2024
None on record
Arjuna Somasekaram Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Sharvanandan Arnold Trustee 07 May 2022
FRIENDS OF MANIPAY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
TAMIL AID LIMITED
Received: On time
Akshayan Athmanathan Trustee 23 June 2018
None on record