Financial history RICHMOND(YORKSHIRE)ROTARY CLUB TRUST

Charity number: 1010117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £893 £910 £1.68k £982 £1.54k
Total expenditure £6.96k £1.15k £990 £1.34k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A