Trustees RICHMOND(YORKSHIRE)ROTARY CLUB TRUST

Charity number: 1010117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua William Huddleston Chair 15 August 2017
None on record
David Malcolm Neil Stewart Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Ian David Hepworth Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Colin Dale Chitty Trustee 03 November 2021
THE ROTARY CLUB OF RICHMOND NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
Colin Pratt Grant Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
MALCOLM JOHN BRYANT Trustee 01 July 2017
THE ROTARY CLUB OF RICHMOND NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
Michael Anthony Pattison Trustee 22 March 2013
MERCERS,GROCERS AND HABERDASHERS OF RICHMOND (YORKSHIRE) CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time