AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1010556

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Al-Hasaniya seeks to serve the health, welfare, social, education and training needs of Moroccan and Arabic speaking women and their families, helping them to access mainstream services to improve their overall quality of life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £424,751

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMEN CENTRE (Working name)
  • AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMENS CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ASMA HARRAK Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
SARA FIKRAT Trustee 26 April 2024
None on record
Dr IMANE EL-HAKIMI Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
LINA EL BAZ Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
MERIEM AGASSIM Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £261.38k £406.06k £346.03k £332.87k £543.90k
Total expenditure £211.72k £278.13k £380.19k £418.10k £424.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £82.81k N/A £97.81k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £82.81k N/A £97.81k £153.18k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £424.75k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £42.48k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £277.88k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BAYS 4&5
Trellick Tower
5 Golborne Road
London
W10 5PA
Phone:
02030484488