Financial history GUILDHE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1012218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £922.28k £943.33k £969.51k £1.02m £1.13m
Total expenditure £785.42k £869.82k £838.33k £969.23k £1.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £920.85k £934.08k £968.68k £1.01m £1.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.43k £412 £824 £12.51k £31.70k
Income - Other £0 £8.84k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £785.42k £869.82k £838.33k £969.23k £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £62.13k £58.87k £60.96k £64.10k £92.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0