Accounts and annual returns DEAF & HEARING SUPPORT (CAMTAD ND)

Charity number: 1012313
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 14 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 14 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 12 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 23 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 29 December 2011 On Time