Financial history CLAREMONT BANK PATIENTS'TRUST

Charity number: 1012358
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £52 £272 £518 £49 £0
Total expenditure £68 £156 £109 £38 £820
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A