Accounts and annual returns ICARE DAY CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1012681
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window