CHERISH FUND

Charity number: 1012868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cherish works with children and families in crisis, in Africa and the UK. In Africa we focus on education, relief and development, while in the UK we have worked with victims of domestic violence, and children in areas of high deprivation. Cherish always works direct with local service providers. All projects have been inspected by a trustee, or other nominated person.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £51,090
Total expenditure: £52,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Malawi
  • Sierra Leone
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHERISH FUND CHILD CARE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Martin Clark MA Chair 18 April 2013
Redditch Youth for Christ
Received: On time
BISHOP HALL'S NORTHFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
Sheila Royle Trustee 27 April 2021
SIR ROBERT LEE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Murray Baxter Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
Mary Mills Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Gail Margaret Teague BA MSc Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Hall Trustee 17 March 2016
TARDEBIGGE CHURCHES TRUST
Received: 166 days late
THOMAS KEITH BARRON Trustee 10 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £19.25k £29.88k £41.39k £51.09k £51.09k
Total expenditure £12.85k £30.25k £38.04k £53.31k £52.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 December 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 08 February 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 07 April 2022 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 18 January 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
Stretton Road
Clay Cross
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S45 9AQ
Phone:
01527547967