Financial history THE INSTITUTE FOR OPTIMUM NUTRITION

Charity Number: 1013084
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.94m £2.36m £2.02m £1.77m £2.07m
Total expenditure £1.87m £2.02m £2.26m £2.16m £2.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £489 £721 £536 £471 £314
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.94m £2.36m £2.02m £1.76m £2.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £755 £94 £565 £5.10k £15.29k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.87m £2.02m £2.26m £2.16m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £43.47k £43.78k £46.44k £48.83k £48.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0