Financial history COTSWOLD SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1013326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.12k £8.21k £8.48k £9.91k £11.35k
Total expenditure £6.93k £7.57k £7.29k £9.32k £10.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A