Accounts and annual returns WRIGHTINGTON HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity number: 1013515
Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 December 2022 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required