Financial history THE KENTDALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1013758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.73k £14.00k £14.37k £14.57k £14.63k
Total expenditure £13.50k £13.50k £14.70k £14.20k £13.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A