Financial history Let's Talk Relationships

Charity Number: 1013811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £413.63k £343.08k £373.53k £408.68k £397.46k
Total expenditure £334.49k £357.63k £357.98k £397.04k £406.91k
Income from government contracts N/A £266.41k £340.92k £331.02k £311.60k
Income from government grants £318.71k £39.17k N/A N/A N/A