Financial history COMMUNITY CARE OPTIONS

Charity number: 1013819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £740.36k £596.80k £650.20k £715.78k £718.73k
Total expenditure £772.53k £691.29k £643.49k £696.73k £726.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £718.73k
Income from government grants £21.58k £29.64k £23.02k £2.67k £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.31k £1.06k £60 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £738.05k £591.40k £650.14k £713.11k £718.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £29.64k £0 £2.67k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £772.53k £691.29k £643.49k £696.73k £726.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.60k £6.30k £7.20k £0 £7.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0