Financial history THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ANAESTHETISTS

Charity number: 1013887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.03m £11.86m £12.40m £13.80m £14.62m
Total expenditure £11.95m £11.70m £12.42m £13.68m £14.82m
Income from government contracts £777.10k £461.61k £480.50k £773.72k £496.40k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £24.68k £4.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.96k £3.27k £13.82k £8.20k £3.10k
Income - Other trading activities £651.24k £168.79k £334.92k £337.43k £380.76k
Income - Charitable activities £9.67m £11.11m £11.47m £12.75m £13.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £644.09k £516.05k £519.86k £623.24k £673.92k
Income - Other £40.99k £56.88k £62.62k £86.08k £136.90k
Income - Legacies £24.63k £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.10m £11.21m £11.98m £12.84m £13.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £845.62k £490.16k £444.96k £635.92k £904.27k
Expenditure - Governance £250.29k £277.04k £446.10k £428.45k £384.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £72.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £43.83k £13.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £207.57k £476.46k