REYDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1013938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising and maintenance of well used village hall for community use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £15,250
Total expenditure: £16,339

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marcus Dexter Kirk Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Irene Robertson Trustee 10 April 2023
None on record
Raymond Stanley Rogers Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Edwina Vera Palmer Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Dorcas Anne Harris Rogers Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Sally Jane Bird Trustee 16 March 2023
SOUTHWOLD DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SOLEBAY CARE FUND
Received: On time
Charlotte Clark Trustee 08 September 2015
FRIENDS OF EAST SUFFOLK PERFORMING ARTS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.69k £4.85k £2.65k £6.62k £15.25k
Total expenditure £12.12k £5.14k £3.63k £4.53k £16.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 October 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Village Hall
Lowestoft Road
Reydon
SOUTHWOLD
Suffolk
IP18 6RF
Phone:
07508510732
Website:

No information available