GILLINGHAM LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer membership to the society, at an affordable cost in return for which we organise a series of lectures on an historical theme. Visitors may also attend lectures for a nominal donation. In addition we provide, maintain and manage a museum of local history, open all year, with free entry to the public. School visits and lectures to local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lloyd | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Evelyn Kathryn Christine Grange | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Edwin PURDUE | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Willis | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anneli HISCOTT | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stephen ROSE | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon CULLINGFORD | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Samuel WOODCOCK | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Louise TOYE | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Joan Hurst | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Peat | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Porter | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN VICTOR WHIFFEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £16.17k | £16.17k | £4.70k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £9.04k | £9.04k | £16.28k | £12.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £11.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1992 as amended on 16 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HISTORY, ESPECIALLY THE LOCAL HISTORY OG GILLINGHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, AND TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH BY THE STUDY OF ANCIENT ARCHIVES AND, WHERE NECESSARY, BY EXCAVATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gillingham Museum
Chantry Fields
GILLINGHAM
Dorset
SP8 4UA
- Phone:
- 01747826235
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window