BIRMINGHAM COUNCIL OF FAITHS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes interfaith understanding in Birmingham through the Faith Covenant, regular interface with the City Council & other statutory & voluntary organisations, coordination of interfaith matters in the city, including the Interfaith Week programme, & production of a monthly Update & Events. BCF has 2 subgroups - Faith Footsteps for a Low Carbon Future & Faiths Promoting Health & Wellbeing Forum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 October 1992: Standard registration
- BIRMINGHAM INTERFAITHS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Nicholls | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bilqees Khawaja | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Ummu Abeeha Mohammed | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Suratia | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hattley | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr PETER ROOKES | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Shenaz Sajan | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
ARVINDER JAIN | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
RUTH NANCY MARGARET TETLOW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £2.09k | £16.36k | £9.89k | £9.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £1.43k | £12.22k | £14.30k | £6.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 June 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF RELIGIOUS FAITHS, SECTS AND DENOMINATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bunbury Road
Bournville
BIRMINGHAM
B31 2DS
- Phone:
- 07703336088
- Email:
- pjrookes@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window