RESOURCE FOR LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Resource for London is to benefit the public by the promotion and improvement of the efficiency and effectiveness of charitable organisations. Its principal activity is to operate a resource centre for charities, providing them with office accommodation, conference rooms, meeting rooms and other facilities at an affordable rent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,052,204
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.05m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £444 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£836,684
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £612.72k | |
Other | £223.96k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £223.96k | |
Charitable expenditure | £612.72k | |
Retained for future use | £215.52k |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 November 1992: Standard registration
- THE RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- LONDON VOLUNTARY SECTOR RESOURCE CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- THE RESOURCE CENTRE (LONDON) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Anne Stevens | Chair | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Gunn | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pandora Haydon | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Pease | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57m | £964.00k | £796.09k | £1.17m | £1.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38m | £1.11m | £710.70k | £1.12m | £836.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.57m | £963.98k | £796.09k | £1.17m | £1.05m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £32 | £20 | £7 | £36 | £444 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.16m | £927.29k | £509.49k | £918.15k | £612.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.88k | £6.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £219.29k | £181.69k | £201.21k | £202.86k | £223.96k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £187.77k | £160.75k | £297.47k | £479.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £132.87k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £719.41k | £563.34k | £702.56k | £466.21k | £476.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £355.07k | £398.88k | £425.67k | £274.48k | £251.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 10/1/1992, AS AMENDED 5/11/1992, 24/1/1995, 10/4/2000, 9/12/2010 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 5/1/2011 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 22 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
(I) FOR THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF OFFICE ACCOMMODATION, CONFERENCE, TRAINING AND OTHER FACILITIES, SERVICES OR SUPPORT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trust for London
4 Chiswell Street
LONDON
EC1Y 4UP
- Phone:
- 02076066145
- Email:
- info@resourceforlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window