Financial history MULTI CULTURAL ARTS

Charity Number: 1015459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.85k £27.83k £29.36k £32.94k £11.38k
Total expenditure £64.59k £5.81k £9.09k £73.08k £12.91k
Income from government contracts £22.18k £23.51k £28.05k £32.10k £6.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A