Accounts and annual returns GOSPEL OAK SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 August 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2023 21 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2022 15 July 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2022 15 July 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2021 15 July 2023 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 August 2020 14 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2020 14 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window