Financial history MERCERS,GROCERS AND HABERDASHERS OF RICHMOND (YORKSHIRE) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1015832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.36k £13.35k £3.69k £4.32k £3.85k
Total expenditure £4.25k £13.75k £4.25k £5.50k £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A