CHERRY BLOSSOM NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school nursery for children aged between 2 and 5 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 December 1992: Standard registration
- 25 July 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1122021 CONSTABLE COUNTRY CHILDCARE
- EAST BERGHOLT NURSERY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.29k | £44.29k | £53.23k | £98.98k | £83.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.26k | £36.12k | £55.73k | £78.32k | £70.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 10 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 10 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 04 July 2012 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 04 July 2012 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 20 October 2011 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 20 October 2011 | 112 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART, B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN, C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
EAST BERGHOLT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window