Financial history M ST J WAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1016457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £399.18k £451.57k £586.71k £486.14k £651.12k
Total expenditure £128.28k £140.86k £166.29k £249.95k £222.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £336.43k N/A £334.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £250.28k N/A £316.84k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £166.29k N/A £222.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.34k N/A £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £103.74k N/A £132.92k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0