Financial history 8TH MIRFIELD (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1016822
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.98k £2.44k £21.85k £17.40k £26.73k
Total expenditure £6.65k £4.14k £11.56k £19.33k £26.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A