Trustees TARLETON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1017090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beryl Rosemary Smith Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Gillian Membery Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Vivienne Lesley Tomlinson Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Michelle Margaret Matthews Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
DEIRDRE COX Trustee 14 February 2022
CROSTON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Received: On time
Ann Day Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record