Trustees POSITIVE STEPS OLDHAM

Charity number: 1017247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Marie Forsdike Chair 06 October 2016
None on record
Iffat Parveen Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Aisha Mahmood Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Zack Colin Maher Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Hayley Harewood Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Holly Louise Harrison Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Umar Nasheen Trustee 04 July 2023
THE ACE CENTRE-NORTH
Received: On time
Mezreet Rasul Trustee 30 August 2022
None on record
Vinesh Mistry Trustee 30 August 2022
None on record
Hannah Jane Roberts Trustee 11 July 2014
None on record