Financial history ROWAN ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1017932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.05m £1.07m £927.41k £766.80k £918.38k
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.01m £834.77k £810.12k £827.63k
Income from government contracts £660.72k N/A £91.42k £421.01k £458.80k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £785 £978 £103 £0 £14
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £660.72k £672.21k £564.78k £421.01k £458.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.26k £314 £195 £1.20k £0
Income - Other £391.10k £397.60k £362.34k £344.79k £459.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.01m £834.77k £810.12k £827.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0