Accounts and annual returns WINDMILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 May 2025 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 May 2025 677 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 September 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required