Hillingdon Chamber Choir

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We perform three concerts each in venues around the London Borough of Hillingdon. Music ranges from sacred to secular . Our objects ensure that people benefit from the joint aim of making good music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 10 March 1993: Standard registration
- SINE NOMINE SINGERS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH WILLIAM DORRICOTT | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER BARABAR SKINNER | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH LAUREL EDWARDS | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £3.60k | £6.00k | £3.50k | £10.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.10k | £4.00k | £4.50k | £8.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2021 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 2ND DECEMBER 1993 AND 18TH OCTOBER 1999 as amended on 26 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Sovereign Close
Ealing
London
W5 1DE
- Phone:
- 07976577232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window