Association of Christians in Counselling and Linked Professions

Charity number: 1018559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Professional Body for Christian Counsellors and Pastoral Carers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £224,972
Total expenditure: £242,811

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ACC (Working name)
  • ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN COUNSELLORS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN MONCKTON-RICKETT Chair 01 January 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAWFORD, ESSEX
Received: On time
Catherine Pozzo Trustee 13 July 2024
None on record
Leroy Harley Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Rev Sean Charlesworth Trustee 16 July 2022
None on record
Rev Christine Pinder Trustee 16 July 2022
FOOTSTEPS - WALKING WITH YOU
Received: On time
Gathoni Hamilton-Foster Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Peter John Roberts Trustee 11 July 2019
NORTH KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
CROSSLINE CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE (MAIDSTONE)
Received: On time
Wien Fung Trustee 11 July 2019
The Stream Collective
Received: On time
Christopher Ross James Williams Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
Rev Anthony Victor Ruddle Trustee
NORTHERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WHITLEY BAY BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £323.19k £194.01k £283.17k £384.37k £224.97k
Total expenditure £302.52k £159.09k £239.84k £383.80k £242.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £39.24k £51.35k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ACC
PO Box 6901
COVENTRY
CV3 9SG
Phone:
08451249569