ILFORD ISLAMIC CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religion and education and recreation facilities in accordance with the tenents of Islam
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 30 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GHAZANFER ALI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Muhammad Imtiaz | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NADEEM SHAKIR | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MASHOOD HAIDER | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZUBER PATEL | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
AHMAD NAWAZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ASHFAQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHULAM HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
GULTASIB HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.61k | £231.91k | £265.57k | £324.24k | £468.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.88k | £264.35k | £246.82k | £228.54k | £349.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 286 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2012
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION, AND FOR THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ilford Islamic Centre
50-58 Albert Road
Ilford
IG1 1HW
- Phone:
- 02085535739
- Email:
- info@ilfordmosque.org.uk
- Website:
-
ilfordmosque.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window