CASPIAN CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1020126
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE LIBRARY FOR IRANIAN STUDIES INVOLVES IN ACTIVITIES IN ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN IRANIAN CULTURE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,084
Total expenditure: £17,603

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • IRANIAN LIBRARY (Working name)
  • CASPIAN CULTURE CENTRE (Previous name)
  • LIBRARY FOR IRANIAN STUDIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Goel Kahen Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Youssef Haji Khameneh Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Mohit Mamudi Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
DR OZRA MALEK MD DPM Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Dr MASHALLAH ADJDANI Trustee
None on record
Dr HOMAYOUN KATOUZIAN Trustee
None on record
Dr NAMDAR BAGHAEI-YAZDI Trustee
IRANIAN MEDICAL SOCIETY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
PARS CULTURAL CENTRE
Received: On time
ENDING IMPUNITY LIMITED
Received: 52 days late
MOJGAN FARZANEH-GHAEMI ADJDANI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.72k £6.92k £15.13k £8.26k £33.08k
Total expenditure £45.09k £45.50k £44.50k £20.95k £17.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 July 2024 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 June 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 June 2021 144 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE WOODLANDS HALL
CROWN STREET
ACTON
LONDON
W3 8SA
Phone:
07962387925