Financial history GUILDFORD EAST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1021177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.65k £18.57k £21.65k £24.59k £47.22k
Total expenditure £30.38k £4.65k £37.57k £27.19k £21.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A