Financial history SPELLBROOK SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.56k £1.67k £3.16k £6.02k £8.38k
Total expenditure £1.93k £5.44k £3.04k £3.59k £6.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A