Financial history SHEFFIELD METALLURGICAL AND ENGINEERING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.68k £19.43k £19.90k £23.76k £24.17k
Total expenditure £14.00k £12.30k £13.96k £17.07k £28.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A