THE WORLD ZOROASTRIAN ORGANISATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to communicate the message of Zarathushtra and Zoroastrianism, and improve the circumstances of needy Zoroastrians around the world through charitable and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Canada
- Georgia
- India
- Netherlands
- Pakistan
- United States
Governance
- 30 June 1993: Standard registration
- WZO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tirdad Sorooshian | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Zerbanoo Gifford | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Pia Sutaria | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SHAHIN BEKHRADNIA | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rustam Dubash | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Darayus Motivala | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rumi Sethna | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Fariborz Rahnamoon | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Maneck Bhujwala | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ZENOBIA NADIRSHAW | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jimmy Madon | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
KERSI SHROFF | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Kayomarsh Mehta | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PARMIS KHATIBI | Trustee | 30 January 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MEHER AMERSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ARMAITY ENGINEER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DARIUS S MISTRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DINYAR JAL MODI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RUSSI GHADIALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BENAFSHA ENGINEER MULLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HOMI KHUSROKHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.48k | £422.34k | £321.91k | £222.82k | £170.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.97k | £84.18k | £212.67k | £172.69k | £164.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGIOUS FAITH GENERALLY AND IN SUCH PARTICULAR RESPECTS AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY TIME TIME THINK FIT.(2 THE PROVISION OF A BURIAL GROUND OR GROUNDS FOR PERSONS OF THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGION AND UP KEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF SUCH GROUNDS.(3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS OF THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.(THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGION.(5.THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR PERSONS OF THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
World Zoroastrian House
1 Freddie Mercury Close
FELTHAM
TW13 5DF
- Phone:
- 02088901282
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window